+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- 4:09 PM 4/5/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 30, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIS, MENARD
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y37 N- E2 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/94
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS SEN ZERO FN (S.STA) 2/23/94
- DP: OLBERG, B.DAVIS
- DP: VEZEY, KOTT, SANDERS, G.DAVIS
- STA RPT 6DP
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NAVARRE
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TAYLOR, SHARP, PEARCE, KELLY
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, DONLEY, HALFORD
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES RPT 3CAL 1NR 3/10/94
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE PUBLISHED (S.STA)
- STA RPT 3DP
On February 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR ADDED: KERTTULA
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor