+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 20
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- VERSION: SCR 15 AM H
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
- PASSED Y40
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y40
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/30 - ON 4/2 CALENDAR
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- TECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/26 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2018
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 15
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: BEGICH
- DP: STEVENS, COGHILL, HUGHES
- EDC RPT 3DP 1NR
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- EDC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor