+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 28
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- 1:08 PM 2/6/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HARRIS, STOLTZE, JOHNSON, CHENAULT, LEDOUX
- VERSION: CSSCR 13(RES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y33 E7
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2008
- READ THE FIRST TIME
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2008
- RES RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
- DP: HUGGINS, GREEN, MCGUIRE, STEVENS, STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y14 N- E6
- VERSION: CSSCR 13(RES)
On January 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL ADDED
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- HELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS