+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 SENATE RESOLVE 9
On July 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- 10:14 AM 6/3/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- TAKEN UP
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- TAKEN UP IN SECOND READING AND HELD
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/15 CALENDAR
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- TAKEN UP AND READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor