+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 34
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 3:37 PM 3/27/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMAS
- VERSION: CSSJR 12(STA)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y31 E7 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 12(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2008
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: DOOGAN, JOHNSON, NEUMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, KELLER, JOHANSEN
- TRA RPT 6DP
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSJR 12(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 12(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2008
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: MCGUIRE, FRENCH, GREEN, BUNDE
- STA RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor