+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 24
On May 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- 1:45 PM 5/20/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 18, 1999 in the House:
- PASSED Y25 N15 SCR 11 AM
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/18/99
- RULES FOR CALENDARING
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y13 N7 SCR 11 AM
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HELD ON THE SECRETARY'S DESK
- READ THE FIRST TIME
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor