+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/25/03
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- LEGIS RESOLVE 20
- 11:27AM 7/28/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS SJR 10(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- SEATON, WEYHRAUCH, CHENAULT, HEINZE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, WOLF,
- PASSED Y38 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 10(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 6DP
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA, OGG,
- GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SAMUELS, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLM
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, WILSON
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 10
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 10
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON, GUESS
- STA RPT 4DP
On March 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor