+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3:07 PM 5/24/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSJR 10(STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, JOHNSON, HERRON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, DRUMMOND, SADDLER,
- GRUENBERG, CHENAULT, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSJR 10(STA)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, MILLETT, LYNN
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- STA RPT HCS(STA) NT 7DP
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, KELLER, GATTIS
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2013
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 10(RES) AM
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 10(RES) AM
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, MCGUIRE, FAIRCLOUGH, DYSON
- RES RPT CS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, DYSON, STEDMAN, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor