+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/20 SENATE RESOLVE 1
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- 2:25 PM 3/9/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- E1 SR 1
- PEARCE, HALFORD, GREEN, MACKIE, MILLER
- COSPONSOR(S): DUNCAN, TAYLOR, LEMAN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/98
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
- DP: GREEN, DUNCAN, MILLER, MACKIE, WARD
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: KELLY
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: ELLIS
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor