+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 4, 2000 in the House:
- REP KOTT APPOINTED BY SPEAKER 5/17/00
On July 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/6 LEGIS RESOLVE 51
- 3:10 PM 5/31/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SEN PEARCE APPOINTED
On May 3, 2000 in the House:
- CC REPORT ADPT Y37 N1 A2 CCS SCR 1
On April 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- CC REPORT ADPT Y15 N1 E3 A1 CCS SCR 1
On April 29, 2000 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DEC) FOR CCS SCR 1
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- (S) FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y- N20
On April 25, 2000 in the House:
- *BARNES, PHILLIPS, KERTTULA
On April 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- *PEARCE, TORGERSON, ELLIS
On April 25, 2000 in the House:
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM N40
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On April 20, 2000 in the House:
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NT 4DP 1NR
- NR: GREEN
- TITLE CHANGE AUTHORIZED BY HCR 27
- DP: JOULE, PHILLIPS, KOTT, COWDERY;
- PASSED Y29 N11 HCS SCR 1(RLS)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RLS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS HCS ADOPTED Y29 N8 A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y14 N5 A1 SCR 1
- READ SECOND TIME AND ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE FIRST TIME
- SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS Y15 N4 A1
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF COMMITTEE ON COMMITTEES
Type:
Primary Sponsor