+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 3
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- 4:00 PM 2/25/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 24, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N30 E3 A2
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N19 E3 A3
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y9 N25 E3 A3
- AM NO 4 WITHDRAWN
- AM NOS 5&6 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 9 AM
- PASSED Y33 N1 E3 A3
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOTT, OGAN, KUBINA,
- PORTER, HUDSON
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- RES RPT 8DP
- DP: BARNES, GREEN, MASEK, OGAN, HUDSON,
- DYSON, JOULE, WILLIAMS
- SENATE ZERO FN (S.RES CMTE) 2/11/97
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y4 N14 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 9 AM
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, TORGERSON,
- KELLY, WARD
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP 1AM
- DP: GREEN, TAYLOR, TORGERSON, LEMAN,
- SHARP; AM: LINCOLN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.RES)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor