+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 8
On March 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- 8:45 AM 3/15/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On March 12, 2001 in the House:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y12 N24 E3 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/01
- VERSION: HCS CSSJR 8(MLV) AM H
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THIRD TIME HCS CSSJR 8(MLV) AM H
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HARRIS, DYSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- MLV HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- FATE, STEVENS, WILSON
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JAMES, CRAWFORD,
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- FATE, HAYES, COGHILL
- DP: WILSON, STEVENS, CRAWFORD, JAMES,
- STA RPT HCS(MLV) 7DP
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- DP: MURKOWSKI, HAYES, GREEN, CHENAULT,
- MLV RPT HCS(MLV) 6DP
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COGHILL, MASEK,
- MASEK, KOTT
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- FOSTER
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MURKOWSKI
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 8(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 8(STA)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DAVIS
- DP: THERRIAULT, PHILLIPS, HALFORD,
- STA RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor