+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2:00 P.M. 6/15/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WOOL, JOSEPHSON
- VERSION: CSSJR 8(RES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 8(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- RES RPT 9DP
- FN1: ZERO(S.EDC)
- DP: SCHRAGE, GILLHAM, HANNAN, RAUSCHER, CRONK, FIELDS, MCKAY, HOPKINS,
- PATKOTAK
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2021
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 8(RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, REVAK, VON IMHOF, HOLLAND, BISHOP, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN,
- HUGHES, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- VERSION: CSSJR 8(RES)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.EDC)
- DP: REVAK, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, KIEHL
- RES RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.EDC)
- DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH
- EDC RPT 5DP
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, BEGICH, MYERS, GRAY-JACKSON
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- EDC, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor