+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, HUGHES, LEDOUX, HERRON, COLVER, GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: TUCK, GRUENBERG, LEDOUX, COLVER, LYNN, HUGHES, HERRON
- MLV RPT 7DP
- REFERRED TO RULES
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, MUNOZ
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 7
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2015
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, COGHILL, MICCICHE, EGAN, STEVENS, GARDNER, OLSON
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- COSTELLO, STOLTZE, MEYER
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 7
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: STOLTZE, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, HUGGINS, MCGUIRE
- STA RPT 5DP
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor