+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
On March 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- 2:45 PM 3/7/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- KEMPLEN, BERKOWITZ
- GREEN, KELLY, COWDERY, DAVIES, PORTER,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGAN, CROFT, JAMES,
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 7
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOTT
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): IVAN
- SENATE ZERO FN (DMVA) 1/24/97
- DYSON, VEZEY, IVAN
- DP: JAMES, ELTON, BERKOWITZ, HODGINS,
- STA RPT 7DP
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- DP: MASEK, KOTT, MULDER, NICHOLIA,
- MLV RPT 7DP
- JOULE, RYAN, FOSTER
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MULDER
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DMVA) 1/24/97
On February 7, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MASEK
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- BRICE, BUNDE, RYAN, KUBINA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, GRUSSENDORF,
- MLV, STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 7
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/29/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- WARD, SHARP, WILKEN, MILLER, DUNCAN,
- COSPONSOR(S): PEARCE, LEMAN, MACKIE,
- GREEN, KELLY, PARNELL, ELLIS, HOFFMAN,
- LINCOLN, HALFORD, TORGERSON
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On January 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DMVA)
- DP: GREEN, MILLER, MACKIE, WARD, DUNCAN
- STA RPT 5DP
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor