+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 3
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- 10:31 AM 3/9/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On March 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- E3
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- O&G HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 5(O&G)
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SJR 5(O&G)
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- RES RPT HCS(O&G) 6DP 3NR
- DP: OLSON, SEATON, ELKINS, CRAWFORD, RAMRAS, SAMUELS;
- NR: KAPSNER, GATTO, LEDOUX
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, SAMUELS
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- O&G RPT HCS(O&G) 5DP
- DP: SAMUELS, GARDNER, ROKEBERG, DAHLSTROM, KOHRING
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- O&G, RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 5
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 5
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP
- DP: SEEKINS, ELTON, STEVENS B, DYSON, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES