+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/25/03
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 11:27AM 7/28/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- LEGIS RESOLVE 21
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 5(STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y36 E4
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSJR 5(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MASEK, BERKOWITZ,
- LYNN, STOLTZE, GATTO, DAHLSTROM
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA, OGG,
- JUD RPT 6DP
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- HOLM, WEYHRAUCH
- DP: SEATON, LYNN; NR: GRUENBERG,
- STA RPT 2DP 3NR
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- WILKEN, GREEN, STEVENS G, DAVIS,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2003
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, OGAN, COWDERY,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STEVENS B, SEEKINS, BUNDE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 5(STA)
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 5(STA)
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- OGAN, THERRIAULT
- DP: SEEKINS, ELLIS, FRENCH,
- JUD RPT CS(STA) 5DP
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: HOFFMAN
- DP: TAYLOR, COWDERY, DYSON, GUESS;
- STA RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor