+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 4, 2021 in the House:
- FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On October 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On August 16, 2021 in the House:
- THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- DNP: KIEHL
- DP: HOLLAND, MYERS, HUGHES
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 1NR SAME TITLE
- NR: SHOWER
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: SHOWER, COSTELLO
- DP: HOLLAND
- STA RPT 1DP 2NR 1AM
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor