+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 30
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2:32 PM 6/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 4(RES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSJR 4(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, REINBOLD, TARR, MILLETT, ZULKOSKY, JOHNSON,
- THOMPSON, KITO
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
On April 15, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(S.RES)
- AM: EASTMAN
- NR: LEDOUX
- DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR 1AM
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- CRA RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: DRUMMOND, LINCOLN, TALERICO, PARISH, ZULKOSKY
- NR: RAUSCHER
- FN2: ZERO(S.RES)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- CRA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2018
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 4(RES)
- PASSED Y16 N- E3 V1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 4(RES)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(S.RES)
- DP: GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MEYER
- RES RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, MACKINNON, STEDMAN
- CRA RPT 4DP
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, BEGICH, STEDMAN, BISHOP, EGAN
- CRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor