+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 11/5 LEGIS RESOLVE 30
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1:30 PM 11/5/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSJR 301(RES) AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 11/4/2015
- RES RPT 6DP 2NR
- DP: JOHNSON, HAWKER, HERRON, SEATON, NAGEAK, TALERICO
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- NR: JOSEPHSON, TARR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 301(RES) AM
- PASSED Y27 N12 E1
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
On November 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 301(RES)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y12 N6 E2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 301(RES) AM
On November 3, 2015 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On November 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y15 N3 E2
On November 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 11/2/2015
- RES RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
- DP: GIESSEL, COSTELLO, COGHILL, STEDMAN, STOLTZE
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): DUNLEAVY, KELLY, COSTELLO, COGHILL, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BISHOP
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- GIESSEL, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, MEYER
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 11/3 CALENDAR
On October 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor