+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/5 LEGIS RESOLVE 10
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- 9:58 AM 6/8/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 12, 2007 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, DOOGAN
- VERSION: SJR 3
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2007
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, GARDNER
- FN1: ZERO(S.HES)
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, NEUMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, SEATON, ROSES, WILSON
- HES RPT 7DP
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SEATON
On April 13, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CISSNA, HOLMES
- HES
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SJR 3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2007
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.HES)
- AM: DYSON
- DP: DAVIS, ELTON, THOMAS, COWDERY
- HES RPT 4DP 1AM
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor