+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (41)
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/4 LEGIS RESOLVE 45
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 1:33 PM 6/3/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- VERSION: SJR 27
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 27
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WEYHRAUCH, CHENAULT,
- SEATON
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DAHLSTROM, MASEK
- DP: STEPOVICH, WOLF, GUTTENBERG,
- RES RPT 5DP
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 27
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y13 N4 E2 A1
- WAGONER
- COWDERY, STEDMAN, DYSON, STEVENS B,
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, WILKEN, OGAN,
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 27
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- RESOLUTION IN SECOND READING
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2004
- ADVANCED TO 3RD READING FLD Y12 N6 E2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/3 CALENDAR
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2004
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: ELTON
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, WAGONER
- RES RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor