+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On July 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 28
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, HARRIS
- VERSION: SJR 27
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y38 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 27
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/01
On May 3, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- NR: GREEN
- DP: KOTT, HAYES, CISSNA, CHENAULT;
- MLV RPT 4DP 1NR
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUDSON
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SJR 27
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 27
- PASSED Y19 N1
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: PHILLIPS, DAVIS
- NR: THERRIAULT, PEARCE;
- STA RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS