+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 37
- 2:55 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MUNOZ, KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG, TUCK, EDGMON
- VERSION: CSSJR 27(RES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y35 E4 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 27(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2010
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- DP: OLSON, GUTTENBERG, TUCK, SEATON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN
- RES RPT 7DP
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 27(RES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGGINS, STEDMAN, MEYER, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, MENARD, PASKVAN,
- ELLIS, HOFFMAN, KOOKESH, OLSON, DAVIS, WAGONER, COGHILL, DYSON, THOMAS, STEVENS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 27(RES)
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- DP: MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS, STEVENS, FRENCH
- RES RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor