+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- SIGNED BY GOVERNOR 8/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 23
On May 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- 1:41 PM 5/16/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 27(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/09/95
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 4/27/95
- NR: KOTT, DAVIES
- DP: AUSTERMAN, OGAN, GREEN, WILLIAMS
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR
On April 29, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MACKIE
On April 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- LEMAN, FRANK
- COSPONSOR(S): RIEGER, DUNCAN, TAYLOR,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 27(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/95
On April 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- RES RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)