+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 37
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- 4:09 PM 3/16/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- RES RPT 6DP 1DNP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, STEPOVICH, WOLF,
- MASEK, DAHLSTROM; DNP: GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 3/9/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 26(RES)
- PASSED Y24 N6 E5 A5
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSJR 26(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, LYNN,
- DAHLSTROM
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WOLF
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 26(RES)
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 26(RES)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS FORTHCOMING 5DP
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, WAGONER,
- DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES