+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- 9:20 AM 6/18/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/22 LEGIS RESOLVE 27
On May 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y14 N4 A2
On May 18, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 25(JUD)
- PASSED Y34 N1 A5
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 17, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N31 A6
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N28 A9
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N24 A11
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGAN, KOHRING, HARRIS
On May 16, 1999 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, JAMES, ROKEBERG, KOTT;
- NR: MURKOWSKI
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.JUD) 5/5/99
On May 15, 1999 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN
On May 7, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD
On May 6, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 5/6/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKIE, PEARCE, GREEN,
- WILKEN, PARNELL
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 25
- PASSED Y16 N4
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: TAYLOR, HALFORD; NR: DONLEY, ELLIS
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.JUD)
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR
On April 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor