+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- 11:30 AM 5/13/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/21 LEGIS RESOLVE 26
On May 6, 1997 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 5, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 25
- PASSED Y39 E1
- GRUSSENDORF NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JAMES
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: ELTON, KOOKESH, SANDERS, MASEK,
- WILLIAMS
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.TRA) 4/16/97
On April 23, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRANSPORTATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BRICE
On April 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 25
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, PEARCE
- PASSED Y18 N1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 3DP
- DP: WARD, GREEN, WILKEN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (TRA)
On April 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRA