+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/18 LEGIS RESOLVE 15
On April 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- CONCURRED IN AM (H) Y15 N- E3 A2
- 2:05 PM 4/14/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 10, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 22 AM H
- PASSED Y35 N1 E3 A1
- MULDER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MASEK, MULDER, KUBINA,
- THERRIAULT, CROFT
On April 9, 1997 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 7, 1997 in the House:
- MLV RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: KOTT, RYAN, MULDER, MASEK, FOSTER
- NR: JOULE
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA) 3/19/97
On April 4, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): IVAN, FOSTER
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- MLV, STATE AFFAIRS
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 2DP 3/21/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 22
- PASSED Y15 N- E4 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: GREEN, DUNCAN, MACKIE, WARD
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
On March 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor