+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 13
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- 9:30 AM 5/9/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- THOMPSON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, JOHNSON, GATTO
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLER, JOHANSEN, FAIRCLOUGH, PRUITT, MILLETT, STOLTZE,
- VERSION: CSSJR 2(RES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y35 E2 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 2(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2011
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- NR: GARDNER
- DP: FOSTER, MUNOZ, DICK, P.WILSON, SEATON
- RES RPT 5DP 1NR
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSJR 2(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGGINS, MCGUIRE, DAVIS, STEDMAN, MENARD, THOMAS, STEVENS
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 2(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2011
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- DP: WAGONER, PASKVAN, FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN, STEVENS
- RES RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor