+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/20 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 11:13 AM 3/22/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ AND HELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSJR 2(JUD)
- PASSED Y33 N1 E4 A2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, JOHNSON, FEIGE, COSTELLO, LEDOUX, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSJR 2(JUD)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 3DP 1NR
- DP: PRUITT, FOSTER, KELLER
- NR: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLER
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 2(JUD)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, GIESSEL, BISHOP, STEDMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, MICCICHE,
- STEVENS, DUNLEAVY, HUGGINS
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 2(JUD)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/8/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/11 CALENDAR
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: COGHILL, DYSON
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor