+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 21
On April 29, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSJR 17(STA)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y24 N3 E2 A11
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 28, 2001 in the House:
- PASSED Y35 N2 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 17(STA)
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MASEK
On April 27, 2001 in the House:
- MEYER, JAMES
- HAYES, HARRIS, HALCRO, GREEN, OGAN,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING, DYSON,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y12 N27 E1
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N26 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/01
On April 17, 2001 in the House:
- STA RPT 7DP
- FATE, HAYES, COGHILL
- DP: WILSON, STEVENS, CRAWFORD, JAMES,
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
On March 30, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 17(STA)
- PASSED Y18 N1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 17(STA)
On March 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- NR: PEARCE, DAVIS
- DP: THERRIAULT, PHILLIPS;
- STA RPT CS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On February 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor