+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 2/6 LEGIS RESOLVE 22
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 11:27AM 7/28/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- LEGIS RESOLVE 22
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION RULED OUT OF ORDER
- RESCIND PASSING FAILED Y20 A16 E4
- RESCIND OUT OF ORDER: SEE HB 271 P 1896
- RECON TAKEN UP: SEE HB 271 PAGE 1896
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y25 N11 E4
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SJR 16
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 16
- PASSED Y22 N15 E3
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MASEK, ROKEBERG,
- LYNN, WOLF
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLM
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: SEATON, DAHLSTROM, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 16
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 16
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, DYSON, COWDERY,
- TAYLOR, SEEKINS, WAGONER
- PASSED Y15 N4 A1
- ELTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor