+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 22
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 28, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 15(RLS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/01
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSJR 15(RLS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HARRIS
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS, KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- KERTTULA, WILSON, STEVENS
- DP: DYSON, COGHILL, SCALZI, KAPSNER,
- FSH RPT 7DP
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
On March 30, 2001 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON
On March 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSJR 15(RLS)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 15(RLS)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- RULES TO CAL W/CS 2OR 3/29 SAME TITLE
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
- ELTON, HALFORD
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, PEARCE, KELLY,
- RES RPT 6DP
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor