+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/21 LEGIS RESOLVE 25
- 11:30 AM 5/13/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y14 N5 E1
On May 5, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 2, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JAMES
- KUBINA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y28 N10 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 14 AM H
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/97
On April 16, 1997 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA) 2/14/97
- NR: BERKOWITZ, VEZEY
- DP: JAMES, DYSON, IVAN; DNP: ELTON
- STA RPT 3DP 1DNP 2NR
On February 27, 1997 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y15 N5
- COSPONSOR:LEMAN, MILLER, SHARP, MACKIE
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 14
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/97
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
- NR: DUNCAN
- DP: GREEN, WARD, MACKIE, MILLER
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)