+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 LEGIS RESOLVE 18
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- 10:35AM 4/10/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSJR 14(STA)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ALL MEMBERS UC
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 14(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/01
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- HJR 16 SIMILAR BILL
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 14(STA)
On March 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 14(STA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): WARD, LEMAN, GREEN,
- KELLY, DONLEY, PEARCE, DAVIS, COWDERY,
- THERRIAULT, HALFORD
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- PEARCE, DAVIS
- DP: THERRIAULT, HALFORD, PHILLIPS,
- STA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor