+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- 11:02AM 6/29/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 44
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 14
- PASSED Y39 E1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SJR 14
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, LYNN
On April 27, 2004 in the House:
- CRA RPT 5DP
- DP: ANDERSON, SAMUELS, WOLF, KOOKESH,
- MORGAN
- FN2: ZERO(S.RLS/DOT)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: MASEK, OGG, STEPOVICH, KOHRING,
- HOLM
- FN2: ZERO(S.RLS/DOT)
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, CRA
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(S.RLS/DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 14
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 14
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 4DP
- DP: WAGONER, LINCOLN, ELTON, TAYLOR
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On April 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 3DP
- DP: COWDERY, WAGONER, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, CRA