+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- FORTHCOMING FIN CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR FORTHCOMING
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (GOV)
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1DNP NEW TITLE
On January 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-NEW TITLE
On March 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- WITHDRAWN FROM FINANCE FOR JUD REFERRAL
- ADDITIONAL REFERRAL TO JUD
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor