+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- REFERRED TO MILITARY & VETERANS' AFFAIRS
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 14
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, FAIRCLOUGH, GIESSEL, EGAN, STEDMAN, MEYER, DYSON, OLSON,
- STEVENS, MICCICHE, DUNLEAVY, HUGGINS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 14
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor