+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 13(RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, SHOWER, STEVENS, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP
- COGHILL, EGAN, KELLY
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 13(RES)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MEYER
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(S.RES)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor