+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/18 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
On March 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- 2:30 PM 3/19/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 17, 1997 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y30 N3 E7
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 13
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/97
On March 14, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGAN
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED Y23 N10 A7
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y17 N2 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 13
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1NR 3/6/97
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEMAN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.RES)
- DP: HALFORD, TAYLOR, LEMAN, SHARP, GREEN
- RES RPT 5DP
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)