+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- 3:25 P.M. 6/19/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 13
- PASSED Y39 A1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SJR 13
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, CRONK, STAPP, JOSEPHSON, MEARS, HANNAN
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- CRA RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: MEARS, RUFFRIDGE, MCKAY, HIMSCHOOT, MCCORMICK
- NR: BAKER, MCCABE
- FN1: ZERO(S.CRA)
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS, GRAY
On February 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 13
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SJR 13
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/14 CAL
- COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI, TOBIN, STEDMAN, STEVENS
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON
- NR: BJORKMAN
- FN1: ZERO(S.CRA)
On February 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON
On February 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, OLSON
On January 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA
+ − Sponsors (9)
DUNBAR
Type:
Primary Sponsor