+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On September 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- NOTED BY GOVERNOR 9/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 18
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- 2:45 PM 4/25/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On April 20, 1995 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND/RESCIND/AM 1 UC
- RESCIND/AM 1 Y32 N3 E3 A2
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y32 N3 E3 A2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 E3 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 19, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N19 E3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSJR 12(RES)
- PASSED Y32 N3 E3 A2
- VEZEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 10, 1995 in the House:
- RES RPT HCS(RES) 5DP
- DP: WILLIAMS, OGAN, AUSTERMAN, KOTT
- DP: GREEN
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 2/14/95
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIAMS
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- WTR RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: MULDER, PHILLIPS, BARNES
- NR: KUBINA
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 2/14/95
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- WTR REFERRAL ADDED
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N11 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 12(RES)
- PASSED Y18 N1 A1
- HALFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
On January 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor