+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- 8:53 AM 5/7/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FSH HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSJR 12(FSH)
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSJR 12(FSH)
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT HCS(FSH) 9DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MORGAN, HEINZE,
- MASEK, WOLF, KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG,
- FATE
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- FSH RPT HCS(FSH) 5DP
- DP: HEINZE, OGG, GUTTENBERG, WILSON,
- SEATON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- FSH REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE RES
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 12(RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, ELTON, DAVIS,
- LINCOLN, OLSON, HOFFMAN, THERRIAULT,
- COWDERY
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSJR 12(RES)
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 6DP SAME TITLE
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B,
- WAGONER, LINCOLN, ELTON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Sponsors (18)
STEVENS G
Type:
Primary Sponsor