+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- IN ACCORDANCE WITH UR 48(B) MOVED TO FINANCE
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 UC
- UR 48(A) REQUEST RECEIVED
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON
- MOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM JUD COMMITTEE FAILED Y7 N13
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- MOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM JUD COMMITTEE FAILED Y6 N14
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- NR: DUNLEAVY, EGAN, GIESSEL, WILSON
- STA RPT 1DNP 4NR
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- DNP: COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GARDNER
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17