+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- PUBLIC MEMBER: RON WILSON (THERAPEUTIC COURT PROGRAM GRADUATE)
- PUBLIC MEMBER: JUDGE CATHERINE EASTER (ALASKA COURT SYSTEM)
- PUBLIC MEMBER: DOUG WOOLIVER (ALASKA COURT SYSTEM)
- PUBLIC MEMBER: HEATHER NOBREGA (DEPARTMENT OF LAW)
- PUBLIC MEMBER: BENJAMIN MUSE (PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY)
- PUBLIC MEMBER: ADAM RUTHERFORD (DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS)
- PUBLIC MEMBER: TONY PIPER (DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES)
- PUBLIC MEMBER: STEVE WILLIAMS (ALASKA MENTAL HEALTH TRUST AUTHORITY)
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- MEMBER: JOSEPHSON
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1:40 P.M. 4/1/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 23
- MEMBER: WIELECHOWSKI (CHAIR)
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N28 E4 A1
- PASSED Y28 N7 E5
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SCR 9
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TUCK, SPOHNHOLZ, LEDOUX
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- TAKEN UP UC
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SCR 9
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK