+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 18
On April 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- 10:45 AM 4/28/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 24, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGAN, JAMES, BRICE,
- CROFT
On April 18, 1997 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- DP: JAMES, ELTON, BERKOWITZ, DYSON,
- VEZEY, IVAN
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA) 3/19/97
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUSSENDORF
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 2DP 3/21/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y15 N- E4 A1 SCR 7
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: GREEN, DUNCAN, MACKIE, WARD
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
On March 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS