+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 11
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- 9:20 AM 4/28/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- VERSION: SCR 7
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, COSTELLO, JOHNSON, GUTTENBERG
- PASSED Y38 A2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2011
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SEATON, DICK, KERTTULA, MILLETT, HERRON
- FN1: ZERO(S.HSS)
- DP: MILLETT, KERTTULA, DICK, SEATON, HERRON, KELLER
- HSS RPT 6DP
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, KELLER, PRUITT
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 7
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, GIESSEL, THOMAS, STEDMAN, HUGGINS
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2011
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.HSS)
- DP: DAVIS, MEYER, ELLIS, EGAN, DYSON
- HSS RPT 5DP
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- WAGONER, DYSON, ELLIS
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, MCGUIRE, MENARD, PASKVAN, DAVIS, EGAN, KOOKESH, FRENCH,
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor