+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/07 LEGIS RESOLVE 1
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- 1:10 PM 2/1/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N15 E2
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N23 E2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN SECOND READING
On January 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RULES FOR CALENDARING
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/27/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 6
- PASSED Y22 N13 E5
- MACKIE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE, TOOHEY, GREEN
On January 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y12 N7 E1
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (AK.SEN)
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 6
On January 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- HELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
- READ THE FIRST TIME
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor