+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
On July 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1:50 P.M. 7/19/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME
- SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS
- PASSED Y33 E1 A6
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SCR 5
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- TAKEN UP UC
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SCR 5
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK
+ − Sponsor
SENATE FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor